Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
American Express Bank Fsb, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Santa Fe Power Solutions Inc, Douglas Godbey Aka Douglas R G, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with Mary Day Coker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2013 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL SATISFACTION OF AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT OF BANK GARNISHMENT | |
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND CONSENT TO FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT | |
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEFENDANT AND INTERESTED PARTIES AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT AND INTERESTED PARTIES | |
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON SUNSTATE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION C/O BRANCH MANAGER ON 6-10-2016 | |
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF GARNISHEE | |
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT | |
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Payment received: $85.00 Receipt Number MX 4657 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.