Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Stephenson, Teresa, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case against Chrysler Group Llc Co Ct Corpo, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 25, 2013 |
CategoryNegligence- Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 17, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Judge: DAVIS , WILLIAM E Assigned | |
September 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 03, 2013 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO PLNTFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FROM DFNDT CHRYSLER GROUP | |
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO PLNTFS INTERROGATORIES FROM DFNDT CHRYSLER GROUP | |
July 24, 2013 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES | |
July 24, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTEMPT FOR FAILURE TO OBEY PLNTFS SUBPOENA | |
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO PLNTFS REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.