Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Chicago Title Insurance Compan, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case against Padot, David Wayne Sr, Podot, Maryann Helen, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with GRIFFIS, STANLEY HOWARD III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 10, 2013 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Chicago Title Insurance Company against defendants David Wayne Padot, Sr., Maryann Helen Padot, Mary Ann Padot, and Maryann Helen Geiger. Chicago Title is a corporation based in Nebraska and authorized to conduct business i...
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 10, 2013COMPLAINT
Date: April 10, 2013AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY
Date: July 09, 2013SUMMONS-DAVID WAYNE PADOT, SR
Date: April 10, 2013NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: June 12, 2013RESPONSE FROM DAVID PADOT SR
Date: June 03, 2013RETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED ON MARYANN PADOT
Date: July 09, 2013RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON DAVID PADOT SR 5/13/13
Date: May 28, 2013PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: July 30, 2013MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT AND DEFAULT AGAINST MARYANN PADOT
Date: August 28, 2013MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT ON DAVID PADOT SR - not entered as response was filed
Date: June 05, 2013RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON DAVID PADOT SR 5/5/14
Date: June 13, 2014NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS OF DAVID WAYNE PADOT SR
Date: July 30, 2013NOTICE OF ACTION TO MARYANN PADOT
Date: July 10, 2013PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S, DAVID WAYNE PADOT, SR.'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: July 23, 2013NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 28, 2013RETURNED MAIL FROM MARYANN HELEN PADOT
Date: March 03, 2014MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT
Date: January 15, 2014MOTION AGREED STIPULATION TO FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT, DAVID WAYNE PADOT
Date: March 17, 2014FINAL JUDGMENT - with attached Fact Info Sheet
Date: April 03, 2014RETURNED MAIL FROM MARYANN PADOT
Date: March 07, 2014MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BE DEFAULT
Date: April 23, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER CLOSING FILE | |
June 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSED | |
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Reopened for CIVIL OTHER on 9/11/2014 | |
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPENED | |
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON DAVID PADOT SR 5/5/14 | |
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL FLORIDA CIVIL PROCEDURE FORM 1.977 | |
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BE DEFAULT | |
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT - with attached Fact Info Sheet | |
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION AGREED STIPULATION TO FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT, DAVID WAYNE PADOT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.