Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Schabeck, Michael, Schabeck, Carolyn, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case against Ginnie Springs Outdoors Llc, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with Mary Day Coker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 14, 2013 |
CategoryNegligence- Premises Liability Commercia |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2014 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Updated Event JURY TRIAL on 10/6/2014 0900 AM Judge MARY COKER results CANCELLED on 9/17/2014 | |
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER ACCEPTING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Exhibit LIST FROM DEFENDANT | |
August 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Exhibit LIST FROM PLAINTIFF | |
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event | OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE -IMPASS | |
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION | |
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST FOR PLNTF | |
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST FOR DFNDT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.