Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Chase, Adam, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case against Trenton Rotary Club Inc, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2013 |
CategoryNegligence- Premises Liability Commercia |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
November 22, 2013 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES | |
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PLNTFS REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
August 19, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS | |
August 05, 2013 | Docket Event | PLNTFS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DFNDTS SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
August 05, 2013 | Docket Event | DFNDTS FOURTH NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTIES TO ADAM CHASE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.