Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hughston, Chelsey Loren, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hughston, Elliot, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with MARY COKER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2013 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 15-E |
Last RefreshedFebruary 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Judge: COKER , MARY DAY Assigned | |
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event | HUSBANDS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 10, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER CONTINUING 1/31/14 STATUS CONFERENCE | |
December 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Event STATUS CONF-FAM LAW scheduled on 2/11/2014 at 1100 PM, MX - Judge MARY COKER presiding. | |
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER SCH STATUS CONFERENCE 1-31-14 AT 11:30 AM. | |
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Event STATUS CONF-FAM LAW scheduled on 1/31/2014 at 1130 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM DAVIS presiding. | |
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event | HUSBANDS MOTION TO RESCHEDULE 1/31/14 STATUS CONFERENCE | |
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DOR INVOLVEMENT AND OBJECTION TO CHILD SUPPORT ESTABLISMENT BELOW GUIDLEINE AMOUNT FOR CURRENT AND/OR RETROACTIVE PERIODS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.