Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Christiana Trust, Kizer, Robert M, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Secretary Of Housing & Urban D, Kizer, Julie M, Unknown Tenant, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with Mary Day Coker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2012 |
CategoryRp/Mf-Homestead Resid $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO CHRISTIANA TRUST | |
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number MX 1290 | |
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE TO CHRISTIANA TRUST FOR $100 | |
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event | BID INFORMATION SHEET | |
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF SALE | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL FROM UNK TENANT - order from 3/13/14 | |
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Report and Recommendation of General Magistrate FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.