Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Household Finance Corp Iii, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case against Jordan, Ronnie E, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with Sheree Lancaster presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2009 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER DISSOLVING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON DRUMMOND BANK | |
May 11, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISSOLVE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event | COPY OF CHECK FROM FINANCE TO SHEREE LANCASTER FOR 100.00 | |
April 30, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF GARNISHMENT WRIT | |
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR GARNISHMENT | |
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
February 03, 2009 | Docket Event | CIVIL COURT NOTES FROM 2/3/09 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.