Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) County Civil ($8,001-15,000) case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with KATHY GARNER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKATHY GARNER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2023 |
CategoryCounty Civil ($8,001-15,000) |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
COMPLAINT
Date: July 27, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED & EMAILED TO PL ATTY FOR SERVICE
Date: July 28, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: July 27, 2023SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: July 27, 2023UNIFORM ORDER
Date: July 28, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS SERVED ON AUG 7 2023 - CORPORATION
Date: August 08, 2023PAYMENT ACCEPTED FOR TRANSACTION 202306108
Date: August 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS SERVED ON AUG 7 2023 - CORPORATION | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT ACCEPTED FOR TRANSACTION 202306108 | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | This item is temporarily unavailable. | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED & EMAILED TO PL ATTY FOR SERVICE | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | UNIFORM ORDER | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY ASSIGNED: JOHN SPRINGER | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | This item is temporarily unavailable. | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.