Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with DAVID FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 22, 2023 |
CategoryFormal Administration |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | This item is temporarily unavailable. | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | This item is temporarily unavailable. | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TRUST | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL CERTIFICATION OF DEATH | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT ACCEPTED FOR TRANSACTION 202306640 | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND BY DONNA JEAN COLLINSWORTH | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | FORMAL ADMINISTRATION CHECKLIST FOR OPENING ESTATE | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE COPY | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.