Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with DAVID FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAVID FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 05, 2023 |
CategoryFormal Administration |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | INVENTORY OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION: NOTICE TO CREDITORS | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO CREDITORS | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION RECORDED IN O.R. BOOK 937 PAGE 533 | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL CERTIFICATE OF DEATH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.