Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) County Civil (15,001 To 30,000) case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with KATHY GARNER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2022 |
CategoryCounty Civil (15,001 To 30,000) |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
|
UNIFORM ORDER
Date: June 22, 2022REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: June 22, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: June 22, 2022SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: June 22, 2022DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: June 22, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 22, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED & EMAILED TO PL ATTY FOR SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: June 22, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 22, 2022FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (OR BOOK 936 PAGE 1112)
Date: June 29, 2023NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: September 15, 2023JOINT STIPULATON FOR FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: June 28, 2023ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASE 22000351SCCA INTO CASE 22000383CAA
Date: February 28, 2023FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: June 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (OR BOOK 936 PAGE 1112) | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATON FOR FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | C7 - DISP UPDATE | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASE 22000351SCCA INTO CASE 22000383CAA | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | COPY OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION OF CASES ARISING FROM RELATED PROPERTY INS LAWSUITS | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | This item is temporarily unavailable. | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | UNIFORM ORDER | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.