Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with DAVID FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAVID FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 23, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION
Date: April 14, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: May 03, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION
Date: March 23, 2022DEFENDANT'S WITNESS LIST
Date: March 23, 2022SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION
Date: May 02, 2022FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 26, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: April 27, 2022PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: May 01, 2022DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 23, 2022STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: July 07, 2022ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: July 11, 2022ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS RECORDED AT OR BOOK 919 PAGE 1131
Date: July 11, 2022ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: April 13, 2022DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 23, 2022ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 14, 2022MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 22, 2022JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
Date: May 16, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: April 08, 2022PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: April 09, 2022AMENDED ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: April 14, 2022NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: May 02, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: May 02, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: March 09, 2022NOTICE OF FILING RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 26, 2022RESPONSES TO FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: April 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 22, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: October 20, 2021MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: November 04, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 26, 2022AMNEDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: October 21, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME, PHYSICAL ADDRESS, AND EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: January 05, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: December 15, 2021DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF CONFLICT WITH TRIAL
Date: February 08, 2022NOTICE OF FILING ANSWERS TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 26, 2022PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: March 21, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: August 12, 2021ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 24, 2021FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 06, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
Date: August 12, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: June 03, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 09, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 11, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: February 23, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION
Date: May 03, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: February 03, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 09, 2022ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS: LEAVE TO AMEND
Date: February 22, 2022PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 08, 2022ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL
Date: October 05, 2021SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: January 13, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE OF GADSDEN SENIOR SERVICES ON 1/20/21
Date: January 26, 2021MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: March 02, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: January 13, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTY WINEGARDNER
Date: January 13, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 13, 2021PAYMENT ACCEPTED FOR TRANSACTION 202100325
Date: January 13, 2021PAYMENT ACCEPTED FOR TRANSACTION 202101018
Date: February 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS RECORDED AT OR BOOK 919 PAGE 1131 | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF ALL SCHEDULED DEPOSITIONS (INCLUDING DEPOSITIONS OF NON-PARTY WITNESSES) | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION | |
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.