Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with DAVID FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: September 01, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: September 07, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: September 10, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: September 20, 2021UNIFORM ORDER
Date: August 31, 2021MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: July 22, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 20, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 19, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF WIFE'S CONSORTIUM CLAIM
Date: August 19, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE: LINDSEY MICHELLE JARRETT 2/12/21
Date: April 27, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: May 28, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: October 27, 2021ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION (OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT)
Date: May 13, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: May 14, 2021STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUION OF COUNSEL
Date: May 07, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 28, 2021SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: January 07, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: January 27, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 27, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 07, 2021COMPLAINTS
Date: January 07, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED AND EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL
Date: January 08, 2021ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL
Date: October 05, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 19, 2021AMENDED DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: July 13, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 17, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: March 17, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 17, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 27, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: March 04, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: March 04, 2021PAYMENT ACCEPTED FOR TRANSACTION 202100188
Date: January 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | DISMISS BEFORE HEARING - OTHER | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | C1 - DISP UPDATE | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/25/2022 AT 9:00 IN ANNEX WEST ENTRANCE WITH JUDGE DAVID MICHAEL FRANK | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT JURY TRIAL SET FOR 5/2/2022 AT 8:30 IN ANNEX WEST ENTRANCE WITH JUDGE DAVID MICHAEL FRANK | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT JURY SELECTION SET FOR 4/29/2022 AT 8:30 IN ANNEX WEST ENTRANCE WITH JUDGE DAVID MICHAEL FRANK | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.