Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with KATHY GARNER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
LETTER FROM DEF TO J GARNER FILED.
Date: September 14, 2021AMENDED INFORMATION FILED.
Date: April 26, 2021LETTER FROM DEF FILED.
Date: August 31, 2021LETTER FROM DEF FILED.
Date: June 15, 2021DEF 1ST APP BEF J MILLER-BOND REVOKED, NO BOND.
Date: May 09, 2021FINAL JUDGMENT (BK919 PG159) FILED.
Date: June 29, 2022COURT DISPOSITION FILED.
Date: June 28, 2022ARREST/NOTICE TO APPEAR FILED.
Date: January 12, 2021ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI FILED.
Date: January 11, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED.
Date: April 06, 2021MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINT CONFLICT FREE COUNSEL FILED.
Date: March 23, 2021NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY FILED.
Date: April 06, 2021MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONFLICT COUNSEL FILED.
Date: March 23, 2021ORDER OF APPOINTMENT FILED.
Date: March 23, 2021INFORMATION FILED.
Date: January 29, 2021SURETY BOND PSE5153431 POSTED FOR $250.00
Date: January 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT (BK919 PG159) FILED. | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF APPEARANCE BEFORE A JUDGE AND PLEA AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RIGHTS FILED-PNC, AG, SERVE 11MOS 29DAYS W/CREDIT FOR 11MOS 29DAYS SERVED (CONC W/21-145MMA), $572 CC, $105 FINE, $50 COP, $50 COD, $50 PD FEE, NO CONTACT W/KAYLA STREETER, REDUCE MONETARY OBLIGATIONS TO A CIVIL JUDGMENT | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT DISPOSITION FILED. | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ASSESSED MM PUBLIC DEFENDER ASST OF $50.00 | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ASSESSED PUBLIC DEFEND FEE COUNTY OF $50.00 | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY PRESENT FOR NO TRIAL ON CNT:1 | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ASSESSED MM COST OF PROSECUTION OF $50.00 | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ASSESSED FINE MISDEMEANOR OF $105.00 | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ASSESSED RAPE CRISIS TRUST FUND OF $151.00 | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ASSESSED FAMILY PROTECTION ACT OF $201.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.