Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) County Civil (15,001 To 30,000) case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with KATHY GARNER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKATHY GARNER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryCounty Civil (15,001 To 30,000) |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
|
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: August 16, 2022DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: April 19, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: December 23, 2021NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: August 15, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 04, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: May 11, 2021MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM TECHNICAL ADMISSIONS
Date: November 02, 2022OTHER
Date: October 17, 2022MOTION FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: August 23, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: February 15, 2021MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: October 19, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED AND EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY
Date: January 04, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: January 04, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 11, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: January 04, 2021PAYMENT ACCEPTED FOR TRANSACTION 202100116
Date: January 06, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: January 11, 2022DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: January 04, 2021NOTICE
Date: January 15, 2022SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: January 04, 2021MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 21, 2021UNIFORM ORDER
Date: October 28, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 11, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE- SUMMONS SERVED 1/25/21
Date: January 25, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 05, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 11, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 04, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: May 11, 2021MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: February 19, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 04, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: March 11, 2021ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIP FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: May 12, 2023JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND NOTICE OF CHARGING LIEN
Date: May 05, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: July 31, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN THE SAME FIRM
Date: August 21, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTY WITHIN THE SAME FIRM
Date: May 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ATTORNEY ASSIGNED: TIMOTHY R ENGELBRECHT | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN THE SAME FIRM | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY ASSIGNED: CRISTIAN ZELAYA | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY ASSIGNED: JOSHUA A BLACKSTEN | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIP FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND NOTICE OF CHARGING LIEN | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTY WITHIN THE SAME FIRM | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM TECHNICAL ADMISSIONS | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.