Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with DAVID FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAVID FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ASSESSED CIVIL FINAL JUDGEMENT OF $10.50 | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT ACCEPTED FOR TRANSACTION 202104042 | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING REPORT OF MAGISTRATE ON FINAL JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE ON SIMPLE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO PROPERTY, CHILDREN OF THE MARRIAGE IN RELATIVE CUSTODY, AND ACCEPTANCE OF FULL MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (EXCEPTIONS WAIVED) | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | C2 - DISP UPDATE | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | RECORDED ORDER APPROVING REPORT OFMAGISTRATE ON TINAL JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE ON SIMPLE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO PROPERTY, CHILDREN OF THE MARRIAGE IN RELATIVE CUSTODY, AND ACCEPTANCE OF FULL MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (EXCEPTIONS WAIVED) O. R. BOOK 894 PAGES 881-894 | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSED BY JUDGE | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING-EXHIBITS | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE/TELEPHONIC HEARING (AMENDED TO INCLUDE NOTICE OF GRANDPARENTS) | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | FULL MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.