Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with KATHY GARNER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2014 |
CategorySmall Claims $501-$,2500) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE OR BK 799 PG 1690
Date: March 06, 2015SUMMONS
Date: September 16, 2014CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 16, 2014NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
Date: September 16, 2014RETURN OF SERVICE- SUMMONS SERVED 10/06/14
Date: October 17, 2014NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT
Date: November 19, 2014SUMMONS ISSUED AND EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY
Date: September 24, 2014STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: September 16, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE OR BK 799 PG 1690 | |
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | DISPOSED AFTER HEARING | |
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | C3 - DISP UPDATE | |
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT | |
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY ASSIGNED: BRYAN MANNO | |
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event | ASSESSED CIV SMALL CLAIMS <$500 <$2500 OF $175.00 | |
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM | |
October 17, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE- SUMMONS SERVED 10/06/14 | |
October 09, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY ASSIGNED: MANNO, BRYAN | |
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event | PAYMENT OF $10.00 BY: FEDERATED LAW GROUP ON 09/25/2014 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.