Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with FITZPATRICK, MARTIN A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 14, 2013 |
CategoryFormal Administration |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2014 | Docket Event | PAYMENT OF $3.00 BY: DVORNIK LAW GROUP, P. A. ON 07/22/2014 | |
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE REC IN O.R. BOOK 791 PAGES 441-442 | |
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event | C2 - DISP UPDATE | |
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event | DISPOSED BY JUDGE | |
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING | |
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event | FORMAL ADMINISTRATION CHECKLIST FOR CLOSING ESTATE | |
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE | |
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF COPY OF: PETITION FOR DISCHARGE: WAIVER OF SERVICE OF COPY OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE: WAIVER OF NOTICE AND SERVICE OF ALL FURTHER FILINGS: RELEASE AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BY NILS PASCAL JEFFERSON | |
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF COPY OF: PETITION FOR DISCHARGE: WAIVER OF SERVICE OF COPY OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE: WAIVER OF NOTICE AND SERVICE OF ALL FURTHER FILINGS: RELEASE AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BY DORIS L . ROSS | |
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event | FORMAL NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.