Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) County Civil ($8,001-15,000) case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with KATHY GARNER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 18, 2005 |
CategoryCounty Civil ($8,001-15,000) |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
|
MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: March 12, 2021PLAINIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF GARNISHMENT
Date: March 19, 2012NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR ASSIGNEE OF THE PLAINTIFF
Date: June 19, 2012AFFIDVIT AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT
Date: February 19, 2014SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY OR BK 777 PG 1979
Date: August 12, 2013NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: September 27, 2017CONT WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: April 15, 2013CONT WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SERVED 06/05/13
Date: June 27, 2013CERTIFICATE OF 77.041 COMPLIANCE
Date: February 28, 2012ORDER ON JUDGMENT ASSIGNEES MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE W/ SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
Date: January 07, 2022CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP RESPONSE IN OPOSITION TO JUDGMENT- MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: November 04, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: July 29, 2021SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY OR BK 758 PG 102
Date: March 01, 2012CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2021CONT WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SERVED TO GARNISHEE 02/22/12
Date: February 28, 2012NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 21, 2021PAYMENT ACCEPTED FOR TRANSACTION 202101948
Date: March 15, 2021CONT WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AGAINST SALARY OR WAGES
Date: February 03, 2012NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: January 21, 2021ANSWER OF GARNISHEE
Date: February 29, 2012ANSWER OF GARNISHEE
Date: June 20, 2013AFFIDAVIT AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT
Date: February 14, 2013REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 21, 2021VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF GARNISHMENT
Date: September 17, 2013MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF CONT WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: April 08, 2013MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: June 04, 2021RESPONSE TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: November 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ON JUDGMENT ASSIGNEES MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE W/ SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED AFTER RE-OPEN | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CRT PRO BEF J GARNER – TELEPHONIC PL/ PRSNT DEF/ FTA THE ATTORNEYS WILL PREPARE AND SUBMIT PROPOSED ORDERS | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP RESPONSE IN OPOSITION TO JUDGMENT- MOTION TO COMPEL | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT MOTION TO COMPEL SET FOR 11/9/2021 AT 2:20 IN JUDGE GARNER'S CHAMBERS WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON JUDGMENT ASSIGNEES MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES IN AID OF EXECUTION | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED AFTER RE-OPEN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.