Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Mccalpin, John Mitchell, Mccaplin, John Mitchell, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mccalpin, Victoria, Mccaplin, Victoria, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, FL, . Franklin County, FL Superior Courts with J GORDON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFranklin County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING BY ZOOM TECHNOLOGY | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 3/14/2023 1100 AM Judge J GORDON SHULER results CONTINUE on 3/14/2023 | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 3/27/2023 at 0300 PM, CA - Judge J GORDON SHULER presiding. | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: SHULER , J GORDON Assigned | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 3/14/2023 at 1100 AM, CA - Judge J GORDON SHULER presiding. | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: SJOSTROM , JONATHAN assigned | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 192023DR000019DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/10/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.