Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Beneficial California Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hembree, Daniel L, against Casonja Washington, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCollections - Consumer Credit (Crc 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions92 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time639 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR JUDGMENT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Not Applicable |
|
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE Not Applicable |
|
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR Not Applicable |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR CLERK/COURT JUDGMENT FILED Not Applicable |
|
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE VACATED |
|
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
COPIES Not Applicable |
|
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR ATTY JACOBS FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT & APPR 4/19/10 - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event | CLERK`S TICKLER WAS SET FOR 8/02/10 AT 7:00 IN DEPT 09 | |
May 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT CANNOT BE ENTERED AT THIS TIME AS TO CASONJA WASHINGTON FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.