Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Farmer, Michelle Massey, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Farmer, James Arther Jr, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, FL, . Franklin County, FL Superior Courts with SJOSTROM, JONATHAN ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFranklin County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | DEPUTY'S WORKSHEET FAXED TO WAKULLA COUNTY SHERIFF OFFICE | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event DOMESTIC VIOLENCE on 7/12/2021 0900 AM Judge JONATHAN SJOSTROM results DISPOSED on 7/12/2021 | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING CASE OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ON TEMPORARY INJUNCTION SERVED 06/19/2021 | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ORDER RESETTING HEARING SERVED ON 06/23/2021 | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Event DOMESTIC VIOLENCE scheduled on 7/12/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JONATHAN SJOSTROM presiding. | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERKS NOTES DEPUTY'S WORKSHEET FAXED TO WAKULLA/CRAWFORDVILLE SHERIFF DEPT | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERKS NOTES PETITIONER PRESENT BY ZOOM., RESPONDENT HAS NOT BEEN SERVED | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RESETTING ON PETITION FOR INJUNCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.