Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Odom, Holly Denee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Paul, James, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, FL, . Franklin County, FL Superior Courts with SJOSTROM, JONATHAN ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFranklin County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 06/23/2021 | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event DOMESTIC VIOLENCE on 6/21/2021 0900 AM Judge JONATHAN SJOSTROM results DISPOSED on 6/21/2021 | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERKS NOTES RESPONDENT PRESENT BY ZOOM FROM FRANKLIN COUNTY JAIL., PETITION FAILED TO APPEAR. ORDER OF DISMISSAL ENTERED | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JUNE 3, 2021 ON PAUL, JAMES EDWARD | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JUNE 5, 2021 ON ODOM, HOLLY DENEE | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JUNE 1, 2021 | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event DOMESTIC VIOLENCE on 6/14/2021 0900 AM Judge JONATHAN SJOSTROM results CONTINUE on 6/21/2021 | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Event DOMESTIC VIOLENCE scheduled on 6/21/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JONATHAN SJOSTROM presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.