Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Langley, Shaylen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Dixion, Wade, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, FL, . Franklin County, FL Superior Courts with SJOSTROM, JONATHAN ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFranklin County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event DOMESTIC VIOLENCE on 5/24/2021 0900 AM Judge JONATHAN SJOSTROM results DISPOSED on 5/24/2021 | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 05/12/21 | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: SJOSTROM , JONATHAN assigned | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 192021DR000063DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/12/2021 | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Event DOMESTIC VIOLENCE scheduled on 5/24/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JONATHAN SJOSTROM presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.