Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cox, Pamela D, Cox, William Joseph, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Dykes, Savanna, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, FL, . Franklin County, FL Superior Courts with SJOSTROM, JONATHAN ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFranklin County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 8/10/2021 0400 PM Judge JONATHAN SJOSTROM results DISPOSED on 8/10/2021 | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 8/10/2021 at 0400 PM, LC - Judge JONATHAN SJOSTROM presiding. | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 7/13/2021 at 0400 PM, MX - Judge JONATHAN SJOSTROM presiding. | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER AFTER HEARING AND SUGGESTION OF DEATH | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: SHULER , J GORDON assigned | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 192021DR000062DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/12/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.