Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Ray, Tabaitha, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, FL, . Franklin County, FL Superior Courts with J GORDON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFranklin County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF CHANGE OF NAME MINOR CHILD | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING BY ZOOM TECHNOLOGY | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: SHULER , J GORDON Assigned | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 4/14/2021 at 1100 AM, CA - Judge J GORDON SHULER presiding. | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE FOR TABAITHA RAY | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | FDLE FINGERPRINT RESULTS | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: SJOSTROM , JONATHAN assigned | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 192021DR000035DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/29/2021 | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.