Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Hale, Patricia Stefanko, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Stefanko, Mary Margaret, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, FL, . Franklin County, FL Superior Courts with SJOSTROM, JONATHAN ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 02, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFranklin County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 06/23/21 | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event DOMESTIC VIOLENCE on 6/21/2021 0900 AM Judge JONATHAN SJOSTROM results DISPOSED on 6/21/2021 | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERKS NOTES PETITIONER PRESENT BY ZOOM RESPONDENT FAILED TO APPEAR. RESPONDENTS MOTION DENIED | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING FOR ADDITIONAL TIME | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event DOMESTIC VIOLENCE on 5/10/2021 0900 AM Judge JONATHAN SJOSTROM results CONTINUE on 6/21/2021 | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Event DOMESTIC VIOLENCE scheduled on 6/21/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JONATHAN SJOSTROM presiding. | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | BOTH PARTIES PRESENT BY ZOOM ORDER RESETTING FOR 06/21/2021 @ 9:00AM ON RESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME. | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RESETTING HEARING | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPOPNDENCE FROM JUDGE / SET FOR HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.