Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Trett, Dewey James Iii, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Warden, Stan M, against Lively, Jody Francis, represented by Way, Ethan Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, FL, . Franklin County, FL Superior Courts with FRANCIS ALLMAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFranklin County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 1/17/2024 at 0330 PM, LC - Judge DINA FOSTER presiding. | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: FOSTER , DINA Assigned | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Reopened for Civil Other on 11/27/2023 | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPEN | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CREDIT | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION PARENTING PLAN AND CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENT | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 7/6/2023 at 1000 AM, LC - Judge FRANCIS ALLMAN presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.