Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Segree, Amber, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Barton, April Justice, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, FL, . Franklin County, FL Superior Courts with ALLMAN, FRANCIS J JR. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFranklin County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Event STALKING scheduled on 1/16/2024 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge FRANCIS ALLMAN presiding. | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FORM PROTECTION | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Reopened for Civil Other on 12/18/2023 | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPEN | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: ALLMAN , FRANCIS J Assigned | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | BOTH PETITIONER AND RESPONDENT PRESENT, RESPONDENT ATTORNEY PRESENT(MICHAEL MACNAMARA) FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION ENTERED | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILD(REN) (AFTER NOTICE) | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE / APRIL BARTON FEBRUARY 22, 2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.