Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Blanton, Michael Chase, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Duncan, Donna, against Venable, Stacy, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, FL, . Franklin County, FL Superior Courts with ALLMAN, FRANCIS J JR. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFranklin County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: ALLMAN , FRANCIS J Assigned | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 3/9/2023 at 0330 PM, LC - Judge JONATHAN SJOSTROM presiding. | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM) | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 12/7/2021 at 0200 PM, LC - Judge JONATHAN SJOSTROM presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.