Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Williams, Johnny, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Kempner, William Albert, against Bacharach, James, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, FL, . Franklin County, FL Superior Courts with SJOSTROM, JONATHAN ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2020 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFranklin County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Johnny Williams against James Bacharach in the Circuit Court, Second Judicial Circuit in Franklin County, Florida. The complaint seeks damages exceeding $30,000, exclusive of costs, interest, and attorneys' fees. The estima...
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 09, 2020REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: November 09, 2020CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 09, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: November 09, 2020SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: November 09, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: November 09, 2020NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: October 01, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 02, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON WILLIAM A. KEMNER 12/02/20
Date: December 07, 2020NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AMENDED
Date: October 04, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: January 12, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Defendant's
Date: December 16, 2020REQUEST FOR COPIES AND NOTICE OF NON OBJECTION
Date: June 23, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES To Plaintiff
Date: December 16, 2020REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: December 16, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE First Request For Production To Plaintiff
Date: December 16, 2020PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 01, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 14, 2021NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE
Date: July 13, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 18, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: January 18, 2021PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: March 01, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: January 18, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES SECOND INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 06, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: March 12, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: April 08, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: June 08, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: April 19, 2021NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: April 20, 2021CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION IN COMPLIANCE WITH FLORIDA RULEOF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.351
Date: April 20, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 06, 2021NOTICE AT ISSUE AND REQUEST TO DOCKET
Date: April 21, 2021NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 21, 2021ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL AND PRE TRIAL, EXPERT WITNESS DATES AND MEDIATION
Date: June 16, 2021CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION
Date: June 21, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION
Date: September 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event JURY TRIAL on 1/31/2022 0900 AM Judge JONATHAN SJOSTROM results CANCELLED on 10/4/2021 | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event JURY TRIAL on 2/1/2022 0900 AM Judge JONATHAN SJOSTROM results CANCELLED on 10/4/2021 | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event JURY TRIAL on 2/2/2022 0900 AM Judge JONATHAN SJOSTROM results CANCELLED on 10/4/2021 | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event JURY TRIAL on 2/3/2022 0900 AM Judge JONATHAN SJOSTROM results CANCELLED on 10/4/2021 | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AMENDED | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES SECOND INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.