Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Beneficial Florida Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Birju, Athma Jai Dev, against Indian Mounds Shores Owners As, King, David J, King, Laura, Tenant 1, Unknown, Tenant 2, Unknown, (total of 9) See All represented by Way, Ethan Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, FL, . Franklin County, FL Superior Courts with LEWIS, TERRY POWELL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLEWIS, TERRY POWELL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2017 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFranklin County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: July 13, 2017COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE
Date: July 13, 2017VALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY
Date: July 13, 2017SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: July 13, 2017NTC OF LIS PENDENS
Date: July 13, 2017DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: July 13, 2017MILITARY/NON- MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 04, 2018NOTICE OF READINESS FOR TRIAL
Date: January 18, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS
Date: April 25, 2018RECORDED NTC OF LIS PENDENS
Date: July 26, 2017WITNESS LIST
Date: March 19, 2018MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY
Date: January 09, 2018ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY PLANTIFF
Date: January 11, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: July 14, 2017PROPOSED ORDER
Date: January 09, 2018ANSWERS AND SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY DISCHARGE
Date: November 27, 2017NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: March 19, 2018MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: January 11, 2018EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 19, 2018DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK
Date: January 11, 2018AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEYS FEES
Date: April 25, 2018NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Date: January 11, 2018NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY
Date: January 11, 2018DEFAULT ENTERED
Date: January 11, 2018AMENDED WITNESS LIST
Date: April 24, 2018WITNESS LIST
Date: March 21, 2018NOTICE OF FILING STIPULATION TO CONSENT TO ENTRY OF IN REM FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: April 18, 2018NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION
Date: April 26, 2018NOTICE OF SALE
Date: April 26, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: August 14, 2018EMERGENCY MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: June 04, 2018NOTICE OF FILING STANDARD AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE
Date: October 01, 2018MOTION TO RESCHEDULE SALE
Date: June 12, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: June 05, 2018BID SHEET SOLD TO PLAINTIFF FOR $277,378.34
Date: August 23, 2018ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE
Date: April 26, 2018NOTICE OF SALE
Date: June 12, 2018PROPOSED ORDER
Date: June 04, 2018PROPOSED ORDER
Date: June 12, 2018FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: April 26, 2018ORDER TO CANCEL SALE
Date: June 05, 2018MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: October 15, 2018ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE-RESET TO 8/23/2018
Date: June 21, 2018FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: April 26, 2018ORDER FOR WRIT
Date: October 23, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: October 15, 2018CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Date: September 04, 2018WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: October 24, 2018NOTICE OF COMPLETION OR COMPLIANCE
Date: October 15, 2018CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Date: August 23, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Date: August 23, 2018AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE
Date: October 01, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE - WRIT SERVED ON DAVID J KING 11/15/18
Date: November 21, 2018NOTICE OF SALE
Date: June 21, 2018MOTION AND PROPOSED ORDER
Date: October 15, 2018WRIT TO BE ISSUED
Date: October 15, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE - WRIT SERVED ON DAVID J KING 11/15/18 | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR WRIT | |
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Assessment 5 Total Assessed $50.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Payment received: $50.00 Receipt Number 14 4738 | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLETION OR COMPLIANCE | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION AND PROPOSED ORDER | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | WRIT TO BE ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.