Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gehret, Dana, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Jimenez, S. Antonio, against Citizens Property Insurance Co, represented by Mcdonough, John Robert, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, FL, . Franklin County, FL Superior Courts with ALLMAN, FRANCIS J JR. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 12, 2015 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFranklin County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL | |
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Judge: ALLMAN , FRANCIS J. Assigned | |
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFITS AND AUTHORIZATION TO ISSUE ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS CHECK SOLEY TO ATTORNEY AND DIRECTION TO PAY | |
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION | |
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Judge: PARSONS , STEWART E Assigned | |
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number 15 3782 | |
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.