Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Zhigin, Nina, Zhigin, Sergey, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with FRANCE, CHRISTOPHER A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFRANCE, CHRISTOPHER A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2024 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2024 | |||
April 07, 2024 | |||
April 06, 2024 | |||
April 04, 2024 | |||
April 03, 2024 | |||
April 02, 2024 | |||
April 01, 2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.