Case Last Refreshed: 2 hours ago
Swank, Janice, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Auto Club Insurance Company Of Florida, Powell, Karen Mildred, Raposa, Donna, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with FRANCE, CHRISTOPHER A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFRANCE, CHRISTOPHER A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2024 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a legal action filed by Janice Swank against Karen Mildred Powell in the Circuit Court for the Seventh Judicial Circuit in Flagler County, Florida. The complaint states that the action is for damages in excess of $50,001, exclusive ...
NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: April 03, 2024NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: April 01, 2024COVER SHEET
Date: April 03, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: April 03, 2024NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 08, 2024REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: April 02, 2024REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 02, 2024SUMMONS PREPARED- KAREN MILDRED POWELL
Date: April 02, 2024MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: April 01, 2024PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2024002182
Date: April 01, 2024ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: April 01, 2024AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 09, 2024AMENDED NOTICE OF EMAIL
Date: April 01, 2024NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 05, 2024SUMMONS PREPARED- AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA
Date: April 02, 2024AMENDED NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CMC ORDER
Date: April 01, 2024PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2024005598
Date: April 01, 2024REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 07, 2024ANSWER
Date: April 06, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 02, 2024REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: April 05, 2024RESPONSE
Date: April 02, 2024NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: April 13, 2024ANSWER
Date: April 03, 2024NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 01, 2024REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: April 03, 2024REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 03, 2024RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: April 05, 2024RESPONSE
Date: April 03, 2024NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS
Date: April 01, 20242/1/2024
Date: April 08, 20242/1/2024
Date: April 01, 20242/1/2024
Date: April 03, 20242/1/2024
Date: April 02, 20242/2/2024
Date: April 01, 20242/15/2024
Date: April 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2024 | NOTICE OF SERVICE | ||
April 09, 2024 | AMENDED COMPLAINT | ||
April 08, 2024 | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | ||
April 08, 2024 | |||
April 07, 2024 | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | ||
April 06, 2024 | ANSWER | ||
April 05, 2024 | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | ||
April 05, 2024 | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | ||
April 05, 2024 | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | ||
April 03, 2024 | NOTICE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.