Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Fifth Third Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by James, Melissa, against City Of Palm Coast Florida, Geldart, James S, Geldart, Pamela K, Unknown Spouse Of James S Geldart, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with FRANCE, CHRISTOPHER A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFRANCE, CHRISTOPHER A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2024 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure - Homestead, Residential $50 - 249K |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This legal document is a complaint filed by Fifth Third Bank, National Association against James S. Geldart, Pamela K. Geldart, and the City of Palm Coast, Florida for the foreclosure of a mortgage on real property in Flagler County, Florida. The com...
COVER SHEET
Date: April 03, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2024CIVIL VALUE SHEET
Date: April 01, 2024NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OR.2844.348. / 2024004653)
Date: April 01, 2024SUMMONS PREPARED- JAMES S. GELDART
Date: April 03, 2024SUMMONS PREPARED- UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES S. GELDART
Date: April 03, 2024SUMMONS PREPARED- PAMELA K. GELDART
Date: April 03, 2024SUMMONS PREPARED- CITY OF PALM COAST
Date: April 02, 2024MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: April 01, 2024NOTICE OF FILING
Date: April 05, 2024CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: April 03, 2024PAYMENT $952.00 RECEIPT #2024002148
Date: April 01, 2024ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: April 01, 2024DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT
Date: April 02, 2024SERVICE - JAMES S GELDART
Date: April 01, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE NONSERVED
Date: April 02, 20241/31/2024
Date: April 03, 20242/2/2024
Date: April 01, 20241/31/2024
Date: April 12, 20241/31/2024
Date: April 01, 20241/31/2024
Date: April 05, 20241/31/2024
Date: April 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2024 | COMPLAINT | ||
April 12, 2024 | |||
April 05, 2024 | NOTICE OF FILING | ||
April 05, 2024 | |||
April 03, 2024 | COVER SHEET | ||
April 03, 2024 | SUMMONS PREPARED- JAMES S. GELDART | ||
April 03, 2024 | SUMMONS PREPARED- UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES S. GELDART | ||
April 03, 2024 | SUMMONS PREPARED- PAMELA K. GELDART | ||
April 03, 2024 | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | ||
April 03, 2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.