Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Bell, Alena, Bell, Kenneth S, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Herman, Patricia K, against Equifirst Corporation, Residential Funding Company Llc, Residential Funding Corp, Us Bank National Association Trustee Ramp 2006Ecf2, represented by Hartley, Adam P, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with FRANCE, CHRISTOPHER A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFRANCE, CHRISTOPHER A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 1982 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
|
This complaint is a Verified Complaint to Quiet Title and Cancel Mortgage Lien filed by Kenneth Bell, Sr. and Alena Bell against U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for RAMP 2006ECF2, EquiFirst Corporation, Residential Funding Company, LLC, and...
PAYMENT $440.00 RECEIPT #2022002269
Date: February 15, 2022SUMMONS PREPARED- U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Date: February 14, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: February 14, 2022SUMMONS PREPARED- EQUIFIRST CORPORATION
Date: February 14, 2022SUMMONS PREPARED- RESIDENTIAL FUNDING COMPANY LLC
Date: February 14, 2022SUMMONS PREPARED- RESIDENTIAL FUNDING CORPORATION
Date: February 14, 2022VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE AND CANCEL MORTGAGE LIEN
Date: February 14, 2022COVER SHEET
Date: February 14, 2022DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT
Date: March 14, 2022ORDER - ORDER ABATING PROCEEDINGS
Date: April 19, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED- RESIDENTIAL FUNDING COMPANY LLC
Date: March 15, 2022NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR VIA ZOOM
Date: April 12, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED- EQUIFIRST CORP.
Date: March 15, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED- RESIDENTIAL FUNDING CORPORATION
Date: March 15, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: March 11, 2022NOTICE
Date: April 07, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 04, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 28, 2022MOTION FIR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: March 28, 2022MOTION FOR ENTRY OF COURTS DEFAULT
Date: March 28, 2022OBJECTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT
Date: March 16, 2022DEFAULT
Date: March 15, 2022MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CLERK DEFAULTS
Date: March 15, 20223/28/2022
Date: April 27, 19822/14/2022
Date: April 01, 20248/14/2023
Date: April 06, 20243/16/2022
Date: April 04, 20243/15/2022
Date: April 01, 20243/29/2022
Date: April 10, 20243/15/2022
Date: April 05, 20245/3/2023
Date: April 02, 20243/29/2022
Date: April 11, 20249/8/2023
Date: April 27, 20492/14/2022
Date: April 04, 202411/9/2023
Date: April 02, 20242/14/2022
Date: April 27, 20608/14/2023
Date: April 13, 20242/14/2022
Date: April 03, 20242/28/2023
Date: April 15, 20244/4/2022
Date: April 02, 20243/15/2022
Date: April 06, 20243/28/2022
Date: April 27, 20704/7/2022
Date: April 27, 20424/18/2023
Date: April 02, 20243/11/2022
Date: April 02, 20247/31/2023
Date: April 02, 20243/14/2022
Date: April 03, 20244/19/2022
Date: April 01, 20243/15/2022
Date: April 02, 20244/12/2022
Date: April 02, 20243/28/2022
Date: April 02, 20242/15/2022
Date: April 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2070 | |||
April 27, 2060 | |||
April 27, 2049 | |||
April 27, 2042 | |||
April 15, 2024 | |||
April 13, 2024 | |||
April 11, 2024 | |||
April 10, 2024 | |||
April 06, 2024 | |||
April 06, 2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.