Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Spector, Richard, Spector Williams, Debra, filed a(n) 2 case represented by Seigel, Daniel, against Fidelity Brokerage Services Llc, Gallagher, Janet, Lees, Scott D, Smith, Traci L, Wald, Peggy, (total of 5) See All represented by Hertel, Ronald A, Johnson, Kelly Overstreet, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 01, 118 |
Category2 |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
|
This complaint is a legal action filed by Richard Spector and Debra Spector Williams against several defendants, including Peggy Wald, Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC, Traci L. Smith, Scott D. Lees, and Janet Gallagher. The complaint alleges that ass...
COMPLAINT
Date: January 08, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: March 25, 2021ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
Date: March 31, 2021PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL ISSUANCE AND COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM
Date: March 10, 2021NOTICE OF MEDIATION VIA ZOOM
Date: May 03, 2021PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT PEGGY WALD
Date: January 11, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTIES
Date: January 13, 2021DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: February 25, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: March 24, 2021MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: June 03, 2021PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DICUMENTS TO DEFENDANT PEGGY WALD
Date: January 11, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: January 11, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: February 09, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTIES
Date: March 03, 2021AGREED ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSAL
Date: June 04, 2021MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT
Date: February 01, 2021OBJECTION TO ISSUANCE OF NON PARTY SUBPOENA FOR DOCUMENTS
Date: January 20, 2021JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT
Date: February 19, 2021MOTION TO COMPEL ISSSUANCE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
Date: January 21, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM
Date: March 10, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED- SUN TRUST BANK
Date: March 15, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED- WELLS FARGO BANK
Date: March 15, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: February 05, 2021CORRESPONDENCE
Date: June 03, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED- MERRILL LYNCH
Date: March 29, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: March 25, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: February 02, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL
Date: March 08, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: February 25, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED- BANK OF AMERICA
Date: January 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- STUART F. MEYER
Date: February 01, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
Date: January 11, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED- MORGAN STANLEY WEALTH MANAGEMENT
Date: March 15, 2021NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR.2514.637. / 2021001266)
Date: January 08, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED- BANK OF AMERICA N.A.
Date: March 15, 2021AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 10, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: January 20, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
Date: February 09, 2021COVER SHEET
Date: January 08, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
Date: January 13, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED- FIDELITY BROKERAGE SERVICES, LLC
Date: January 13, 2021PAYMENT $429.00 RECEIPT #2021000367
Date: January 08, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- PEGGY WALD
Date: January 08, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- FIDELITY BROKERAGE SERVICES LLC
Date: January 08, 20211/13/2021
Date: May 03, 20242/25/2021
Date: May 02, 20246/3/2021
Date: May 05, 20243/15/2021
Date: May 01, 20243/25/2021
Date: May 02, 20242/19/2021
Date: May 03, 20242/5/2021
Date: May 02, 20243/3/2021
Date: May 16, 20241/8/2021
Date: May 03, 20241/20/2021
Date: May 02, 20243/10/2021
Date: May 01, 1181/8/2021
Date: May 01, 20651/13/2021
Date: May 11, 20241/21/2021
Date: May 11, 20241/8/2021
Date: May 02, 20243/8/2021
Date: May 02, 20242/25/2021
Date: May 03, 20243/31/2021
Date: May 02, 20241/20/2021
Date: May 03, 20241/28/2021
Date: May 01, 20242/2/2021
Date: May 02, 20245/3/2021
Date: May 02, 20243/10/2021
Date: May 03, 20241/8/2021
Date: May 01, 20241/11/2021
Date: May 05, 20243/24/2021
Date: May 05, 20242/9/2021
Date: May 06, 20242/1/2021
Date: May 02, 20241/11/2021
Date: May 04, 20241/11/2021
Date: May 02, 20243/10/2021
Date: May 01, 20341/11/2021
Date: May 03, 20246/4/2021
Date: May 02, 20243/29/2021
Date: May 01, 20242/9/2021
Date: May 03, 20246/3/2021
Date: May 01, 20242/1/2021
Date: May 04, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2065 | |||
May 01, 2034 | |||
May 16, 2024 | |||
May 11, 2024 | |||
May 11, 2024 | |||
May 06, 2024 | |||
May 05, 2024 | |||
May 05, 2024 | |||
May 05, 2024 | |||
May 04, 2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.