Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bradley, Matthew, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Seigel, Daniel, against Jackson National Life Insurance Company, Kaser, Carol, Metlife Services And Solutions, Llc, Reese, Robert, The Northern Trust Company, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther-Trust Litigation |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeTrusts |
This complaint is filed by Matthew Bradley against defendants Robert Reese and Carol Kaser. The purpose of the complaint is to invalidate a trust and quit claim deeds that were obtained as a result of Carol's undue influence over Hallie M. Bradley, t...
NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT
Date: February 11, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: February 11, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: February 11, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT
Date: February 11, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: June 08, 2021JOINT NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: June 08, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTIES
Date: March 26, 2021AMENDED ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 29, 2021MOTION TO INTERVENE
Date: April 22, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL- JACKSON NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: April 15, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY
Date: April 08, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: March 29, 2021MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM
Date: March 30, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: March 30, 2021OBJECTION TO DISCOVERY REQUEST
Date: April 07, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- ROBERT REESE
Date: February 11, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- CAROL KASER
Date: February 11, 2021COVER SHEET
Date: February 11, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: March 17, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED- SUNTRUST BANK
Date: March 15, 2021COUNTERCLAIM TO AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 18, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED- METLIFE SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS LLC
Date: March 15, 2021PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2021002205
Date: February 11, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- METLIFE SERVICES AND SOLUTIONS, LLC
Date: March 08, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- JACKSON NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: March 08, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- FRANKLIN TEMPLETON FINANCIAL SERVICES CORP
Date: March 08, 2021PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2021003628
Date: March 08, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED - THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY
Date: March 08, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- SUNTRUST BANK
Date: March 08, 2021PAYMENT $395.00 RECEIPT #2021004417
Date: March 19, 2021NOTICE OF EMAIL
Date: March 22, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED- FRANKLIN TEMPLETON FINANCIAL SERVICES CORP.
Date: March 15, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
Date: March 09, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED- JACKSON NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE
Date: March 15, 2021PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT
Date: March 09, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED- THE NORTHAN TRUST COMPANY
Date: March 15, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: February 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - ROBERT REESE
Date: February 19, 2021AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 08, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: February 23, 2021PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: February 12, 2021ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: February 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | JOINT NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO INTERVENE | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL- JACKSON NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO DISCOVERY REQUEST | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.