Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rudy, Michael, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Olsen, Gregory A, against The Standard Fire Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePERKINS, TERENCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by the Plaintiff, Michael Rudy, against the Defendant, The Standard Fire Insurance Company. The Plaintiff alleges that he suffered bodily injuries and related damages as a result of the negligent operation of an uninsured or u...
COMPLAINT
Date: January 18, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT
Date: April 27, 2021PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: April 06, 2021PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: May 18, 2021PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT
Date: April 27, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: April 20, 2021PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE AFFIDAVIT & SUMMONS
Date: April 06, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF MICHAEL RUDY
Date: May 05, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: July 06, 2021FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET
Date: October 11, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: August 17, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 02, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 26, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: May 24, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: June 02, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: October 11, 2021REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: April 21, 2021COVER SHEET
Date: January 18, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: January 18, 2021PLAINTIFFS DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: April 21, 2021PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021000739
Date: January 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS INTERROGATORIES | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.