Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Geico General Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Reiss, Jennifer L, against Davis, Shafaira Elexis, Scott, Rose Merry, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by GEICO General Insurance Company as the subrogee of Albert Joseph Becker against Shafaira Elexis Davis and Rose Merry Scott. The complaint alleges that on April 8, 2020, Davis negligently operated a motor vehicle in Flagler ...
COMPLAINT
Date: January 12, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: February 04, 2022MOTION FOR CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: April 28, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON ROSE MERRY SCOTT
Date: March 25, 2021MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME AS TO SERVICE
Date: April 21, 2021PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2021000530
Date: January 12, 2021CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.2562.1516. / 2021026744)
Date: May 12, 2021PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2021017734
Date: November 10, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO GARNISHEE
Date: November 17, 2021DEFAULT AS TO GARNISHEE
Date: November 17, 2021NOTICE OF DEFENDANT OF RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHMENT OF WAGES MONEY, AND OTHER PROPERTY
Date: September 15, 2021FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT SHAFAIRA ELEXIS DAVIS ONLY
Date: July 30, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: December 07, 2021NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT
Date: October 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT PROOF OF CLAIM
Date: June 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS
Date: June 09, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: October 13, 2021DEFAULT
Date: May 25, 2021NOTICE TO PRODUCE
Date: October 13, 2021NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT
Date: October 11, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: October 11, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED- AMIDON NURSE STAFFIC ((GARNISHEE))
Date: September 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE
Date: May 25, 2021MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: September 01, 2021PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2021014069
Date: September 02, 2021WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: September 02, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: May 25, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 09, 2021FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET
Date: May 19, 2021MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO ONLY SHAFAIRA ELEXIS DAVIS
Date: June 09, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED- SHAFAIRA ALEXIS DAVIS
Date: April 21, 2021NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: January 12, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- ROSE MERRY SCOTT
Date: January 12, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- SHAFAIRA ELEXIS DAVIS
Date: January 12, 2021COVER SHEET
Date: January 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO GARNISHEE | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAULT AS TO GARNISHEE | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2021017734 | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PRODUCE | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.