Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Diaz, Daniel, Diaz, Heather, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Long, Jesse, against Homeowners Choice Property And Casualty Insurance, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePERKINS, TERENCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2021 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Daniel Diaz and Heather Diaz against Homeowners Choice Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Inc. The plaintiffs allege a breach of contract and demand a jury trial. The jurisdiction of the court is established as the loss...
COMPLAINT
Date: January 08, 2021COVER SHEET
Date: January 08, 2021FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET
Date: December 29, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: December 29, 2021PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 28, 2021PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 28, 2021NOTICE OF FILING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 14, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: July 19, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 12, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 23, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 29, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 29, 2021PRIVILEGE LOG
Date: March 12, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.
Date: January 08, 2021RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 12, 2021RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: March 12, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: February 01, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: January 28, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: February 08, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: January 08, 2021PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021000400
Date: January 11, 2021PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT
Date: January 08, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT
Date: January 08, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT
Date: January 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS PROPOSED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO QUASH REQUEST TO DEPOSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.