Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cox, Diane L, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with TOTTEN, ANDREA K presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2019 |
CategoryFormal Administration |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2020009137 | |
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event | INVENTORY | |
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : CPINV REQUIRED BY: 06/17/2020 | |
May 16, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO FILE INVENTORY | |
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event | FORMAL NOTICE | |
January 11, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO CREDITORS | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE TAKING POSSESSION OF PROTECTED HOMESTEAD | |
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - Recorded (OR.2389.1606. / 2019037422) | |
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (OR.2389.1607. / 2019037423) | |
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | CHECKLIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.