Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sacca, Frank, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with TOTTEN, ANDREA K presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2019 |
CategorySummary Administration Over 1000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (OR.2409.901. / 2019048692) | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | FOLLOW-UP REVIEW | |
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT REVIEW AND ORDER | |
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES | |
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2019013282 | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE-ORIGINAL | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE- COMPLETE- MAILED OUT 12/31/19 | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT-ORIGINAL - Recorded (OR.2409.893. / 2019048691) | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | CONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.