Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rogero, Norma Lowe, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with TOTTEN, ANDREA K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTOTTEN, ANDREA K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2019 |
CategoryFormal Administration |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Recorded (OR.2437.616. / 2020015535) | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | FOLLOW-UP REVIEW | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : CPORD30 REQUIRED BY: 02/18/2020 | |
January 19, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT REVIEW AND ORDER | |
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | CHECKLIST | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISCHARGE | |
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.