Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Us Bank National Association Not In Its Individ, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Diaz, Roy A, against Caputi, Melissa, Citibank South Dakota Na, Grand Haven Master Association Inc, Mccarrick, Martin E, Quik Capital Llc Dba Sterling Funding, (total of 9) See All represented by Mattingly, K. Joy, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 26, 2018 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
|
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by U.S. Bank National Association, acting as the trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT, against multiple defendants including Martin E. McCarrick, Grand Haven Master Association, Inc., Citibank (Sout...
SUMMONS PREPARED- MARTIN E. MCCARRICK
Date: May 02, 2024PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2019009245
Date: May 02, 2024SUMMONS PREPARED- DEPT. OF REVENUE C/O JAMES ZINGALE (EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR)
Date: May 01, 2024CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Date: May 03, 2024SUMMONS PREPARED- CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA, N.A.
Date: May 01, 2024SUMMONS PREPARED- UNKNOWN TENANT 1
Date: May 02, 2024SUMMONS PREPARED- UNKNOWN TENANT 2
Date: May 02, 2024ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER (EMAILED SERVICE LIST)
Date: May 03, 2024PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: May 01, 2024PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2019014600
Date: May 02, 2024SUMMONS PREPARED- BROADCAST MUSIC INC.
Date: May 01, 2024AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Date: May 05, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: May 03, 2057SUMMONS PREPARED- USA US ATTORNEY
Date: May 02, 2024PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2019006235
Date: May 02, 2024MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Date: May 10, 2024CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Date: May 02, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE NONSERVED
Date: May 04, 2024PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2020003452
Date: May 02, 2024NOTICE OF FILING LOAN DOCUMENTS ((RECEIVED AND SENT TO RECORDS FOR STORAGE))
Date: May 27, 2024SUMMONS PREPARED- GRAND HAVEN MASTER ASSOCIATION
Date: May 01, 2024PAYMENT $2,018.00 RECEIPT #2018021754
Date: May 02, 2024AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 03, 2056CERTIFICATE OF TITLE - Recorded (OR.2430.483. / 2020011886)
Date: May 02, 2024CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: May 08, 2024SUMMONS PREPARED- MARTIN E MCCARRICK
Date: May 02, 2024SUMMONS PREPARED- MELISSA CAPUTI
Date: May 02, 2024SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE - Recorded (OR.2412.244. / 2020001390)
Date: May 07, 2024NOTICE OF SALE
Date: May 02, 202411/26/2018
Date: May 02, 202411/26/2018
Date: May 01, 20241/29/2019
Date: May 03, 20242/14/2019
Date: May 04, 20241/27/2020
Date: May 27, 20249/20/2019
Date: May 05, 20241/10/2020
Date: May 08, 20242/24/2020
Date: May 02, 202411/27/2018
Date: May 02, 202411/26/2018
Date: May 03, 20577/29/2019
Date: May 01, 20242/20/2019
Date: May 03, 20565/15/2019
Date: May 02, 20249/20/2019
Date: May 10, 20246/11/2019
Date: May 01, 20244/3/2019
Date: May 02, 20241/9/2020
Date: May 02, 20241/8/2020
Date: May 07, 20243/23/2020
Date: May 02, 20243/6/2020
Date: May 02, 20244/17/2019
Date: May 03, 20247/30/2019
Date: May 02, 2024AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 20, 2019SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE - Recorded (OR.2412.244. / 2020001390)
Date: January 08, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: November 26, 2018SUMMONS PREPARED- UNKNOWN TENANT 1
Date: May 15, 2019NOTICE OF SALE
Date: January 09, 2020PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2020003452
Date: February 24, 2020CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Date: March 06, 2020PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: June 11, 2019SUMMONS PREPARED- UNKNOWN TENANT 2
Date: May 15, 2019ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER (EMAILED SERVICE LIST)
Date: April 17, 2019PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2019009245
Date: May 15, 2019SUMMONS PREPARED- MARTIN E. MCCARRICK
Date: April 03, 2019PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2019006235
Date: April 03, 2019PAYMENT $2,018.00 RECEIPT #2018021754
Date: November 27, 2018CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Date: January 29, 2019SUMMONS PREPARED- GRAND HAVEN MASTER ASSOCIATION
Date: November 26, 2018SUMMONS PREPARED- CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA, N.A.
Date: November 26, 2018NOTICE OF FILING LOAN DOCUMENTS ((RECEIVED AND SENT TO RECORDS FOR STORAGE))
Date: January 27, 2020MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Date: September 20, 2019CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: January 10, 2020CERTIFICATE OF TITLE - Recorded (OR.2430.483. / 2020011886)
Date: March 23, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Date: September 20, 2019SUMMONS PREPARED- BROADCAST MUSIC INC.
Date: July 29, 2019PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2019014600
Date: July 30, 2019SUMMONS PREPARED- UNKNOWN TENANT 2
Date: November 26, 2018SUMMONS PREPARED- DEPT. OF REVENUE C/O JAMES ZINGALE (EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR)
Date: November 26, 2018SUMMONS PREPARED- USA US ATTORNEY
Date: November 26, 2018SUMMONS PREPARED- UNKNOWN TENANT 1
Date: November 26, 2018SUMMONS PREPARED- QUIK CAPITAL LLC D/B/A STERLING FUNDING C/O PAUL HUNTER R.A.
Date: November 26, 2018SUMMONS PREPARED- MELISSA CAPUTI
Date: November 26, 2018SUMMONS PREPARED- MARTIN E MCCARRICK
Date: November 26, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE NONSERVED
Date: February 14, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2057 | COMPLAINT | ||
May 03, 2057 | |||
May 03, 2056 | AMENDED COMPLAINT | ||
May 03, 2056 | |||
May 27, 2024 | NOTICE OF FILING LOAN DOCUMENTS ((RECEIVED AND SENT TO RECORDS FOR STORAGE)) | ||
May 27, 2024 | |||
May 10, 2024 | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS | ||
May 10, 2024 | |||
May 08, 2024 | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE | ||
May 08, 2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.