Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Onewest Bank Na, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Osborne, David, against Edmonds, David A, Edmonds, Roxanne, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with DUPONT, SCOTT C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDUPONT, SCOTT C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2015 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
|
NOTICE OF FILING MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: April 13, 2015DEFENDANT'S FIRST AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS CAUSE OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: March 23, 2015MOTION
Date: February 04, 2015ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND DIRECTING PRE-TRIAL PROCEDURE
Date: July 20, 2015STIPULATED CONSENT TO FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: October 30, 2015FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: November 13, 2015MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL
Date: March 23, 2016VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT
Date: February 04, 2015DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES IN RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT
Date: May 18, 20152/4/2015
Date: April 02, 20242/9/2015
Date: April 01, 20242/4/2015
Date: April 01, 20242/4/2015
Date: April 26, 20397/20/2015
Date: April 02, 20245/18/2015
Date: April 06, 20243/23/2015
Date: April 08, 202411/13/2015
Date: April 05, 202410/8/2015
Date: April 04, 20245/22/2015
Date: April 03, 20248/16/2017
Date: April 01, 20244/13/2015
Date: April 04, 20248/15/2017
Date: April 26, 203610/30/2015
Date: April 02, 20246/1/2015
Date: April 06, 202411/24/2015
Date: April 01, 20243/15/2016
Date: April 01, 20246/17/2015
Date: April 01, 20243/23/2016
Date: April 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2039 | |||
April 26, 2036 | |||
April 08, 2024 | |||
April 06, 2024 | |||
April 06, 2024 | |||
April 05, 2024 | |||
April 04, 2024 | |||
April 04, 2024 | |||
April 03, 2024 | |||
April 02, 2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.