Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Fl Dept Of Revenue Obo Melissa Sambolin, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Chia, Ramon P, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with HEARING OFFICER, CHILD SUPPORT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2008 |
CategoryChild Support - Dor |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO PETITON FOR SUPPORT | |
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event | CIRC CIV COPIES $1.00 RECEIPT: 83685 DATE: 06/19/2009/ Pages: 2 | |
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED- 06/01/2009 RAMON P CHIA (RESPONDENT); | |
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED RAMON P CHIA (RESPONDENT); | |
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NONSERVED- RAMON P CHIA (RESPONDENT); | |
December 12, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED RAMON P CHIA (RESPONDENT); | |
December 11, 2008 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR CHILD SUPPORT/FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT | |
December 11, 2008 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET CHILD SUPPORT | |
December 11, 2008 | Docket Event | SUPPORT INFORMATION SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.