Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Emc Morgage Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Nilsen, Rebecca S, against Unkn Tenant, Vasilevskiy, Unkn Spse Of Yefim, Vasilevskiy, Yefim, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with CRAIG, DENNIS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2008 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure (Pre2010) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS OR BK 1838 PG 1096 | |
October 20, 2011 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION | |
October 20, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 31, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFF | |
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - CANCELLED 11/10/10/ Pages: 2 | |
September 17, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER SHOWING GOOD CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD REMAIN PENDING/ Pages: 2 | |
August 27, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STATUS/ Pages: 2 | |
June 23, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PROSCUTE | |
May 06, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF TIME AND EFFORT/ Pages: 6 | |
May 06, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE/ Pages: 3 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.